Docket History
6/3/2014
ENTRY GRANTING MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JULY 15, 2014 @ 8:30 AM
6/3/2014
ENTRY GRANTING MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JULY 15, 2014 @ 8:30 AM
6/3/2014
ENTRY GRANTING MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JULY 15, 2014 @ 8:30 AM
12/19/2011
Dependent Health Care Order; Qualified Medical Child Support Orders
12/19/2011
Decree of Shared Parenting
12/19/2011
Entry changing name
12/19/2011
Final Judgment and Decree of Dissolution
10/13/2011
Order scheduling Final Hearing-Dissolution
10/11/2011
Order requiring parties to attend "Helping Children Succeed After Divorce" seminar
10/7/2011
DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN