Docket History
8/27/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- SEPT 27, 2012 @ 8:30 AM
3/27/2012
Order Scheduling Trial
3/15/2012
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
1/30/2012
ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE
1/24/2012
Magistrate Order for continuance to be filed within 14 days
12/28/2011
Rule 60(A) Entry Correcting Clerical Mistake
12/22/2011
Pretrial Order
12/15/2011
Defendant's Motion for Continuance
12/15/2011
Entry GRANTING Continuance; continued to Jan 12, 2012
11/15/2011
MOTION AND NOTICE OF HEARING
10/28/2011
Magistrate Order
10/19/2011
Notice of Substitution of Counsel for Plaintiff
10/19/2011
Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance
10/19/2011
Order for Continuance until Dec 20
10/18/2011
Order scheduling Pretrial Conference/Trial
10/11/2011
Notice of change of address
12/31/1969
Magistrate’s Decision and Permanent Order