Docket History
5/17/2012
ENTRY
4/20/2012
CONTINUANCE ORDER
4/13/2012
Order Scheduling Settlement Conference
1/25/2012
Temporary Order
1/25/2012
Order GRANTING Interim Atty Fees
1/24/2012
Agreed Order
12/9/2011
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE
12/1/2011
Motion for Temporary Orders
11/15/2011
ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
11/4/2011
Entry GRANTING Continuance until March 26, 2012
11/4/2011
Motion for Continuance
11/4/2011
Entry GRANTING Continuance until March 26, 2012
10/26/2011
Order Scheduling Trial: On
10/24/2011
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL ENTRY