Docket History
9/5/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- SEPT 25, 2013 @ 3:30 PM
1/24/2013
AMENDED SEEK WORK ORDER - AND ORDER TO REPORT TO JOB CENTER (AS STATED) FILED AND ISSUED:
CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT (CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT);
1/15/2013
SEEK WORK ORDER - AND ORDER TO REPORT TO JOB CENTER (AS STATED) FILED AND ISSUED:
10/31/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JANUARY 9, 2013 @ 1:30 PM
10/24/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- NOVEMBER 8, 2012 @ 11:00 AM
6/29/2012
SEEK WORK ORDER - AND ORDER TO REPORT TO JOB CENTER (AS STATED) FILED AND ISSUED:
CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT (CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT);
11/30/2011
Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance
11/30/2011
Entry of Continuance; continued to Feb 24, 2012