Docket History
5/19/2016
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 06/21/2016 @ 3:30 PM
5/19/2016
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 06/21/2016 @ 3:30 PM
5/19/2016
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 06/21/2016 @ 3:30 PM
6/2/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JULY 8. 2014 @ 1:30 PM
6/2/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JULY 8. 2014 @ 1:30 PM
1/17/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- MARCH 22, 2013 @ 1:30 PM
3/22/2012
ENTRY DISMISSING MOTION FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
1/18/2012
Order scheduling settlement conference/trial
12/5/2011
Motion to Vacate settlement conference date