Docket History
1/9/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- MARCH 1, 2013 @ 1:30 PM
11/19/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG-1-8-13 @ 3:30PM
10/29/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- MARCH 2013 @ 9:30 AM
6/18/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 7-31-12 @9:30 A.M.
5/8/2012
Order Scheduling Settlement Conference
5/4/2012
DEFENDANT'S PRETRIAL STATEMENT
4/13/2012
ENTRY DISMISSING MOTION FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
2/21/2012
AGREED ENTRY OF CONTINUANCE
2/17/2012
Order Scheduling Settlement Conference
1/17/2012
Hearing Notice
12/27/2011
Notice of change of address
12/14/2011
Plaintiff's Pretrial Statement