Docket History
4/23/2012
Order Scheduling Telephone Pretrial Conference/Settlement Conference
12/28/2011
Order scheduling Pretrial Conference/settlement conference
12/27/2011
Agreed Entry
12/27/2011
Answer of Defendant
12/6/2011
Motion to dismiss the conciliation and reinstate the case
11/10/2011
NOTICE OF 90-DAY DELAY
10/26/2011
Notice of Hearing (Petition for Conciliation); Motion for Reinstatement of FConciliation Petition
10/5/2011
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR INTERIM ATTORNEY FEES
10/4/2011
TEMPORARY ORDER
10/4/2011
TEMPORARY ORDER