Docket History
1/4/2013
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JANUARY 14, 2013 @ 9:00 AM (2 HOURS)
11/19/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 01/11/13 @ 1:30PM
10/2/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- OCTOBER 12, 2012 @ 8:30 AM
11/30/2011
Order scheduling Pretrial Conference/settlement conference
11/29/2011
Motion and Entry for Restraining Orders
11/29/2011
Entry GRANTING Restraining Orders
11/29/2011
Notice to the Court of Request for Production of Documents
11/29/2011
Answer of Defendant
11/15/2011
ORDER SCHEDULING FINAL HEARING
10/31/2011
For divorce and other relief