Docket History
7/27/2015
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 09/28/2015 @ 1:30 PM
11/5/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- DECEMBER 5, 2012 @ 9:00 AM
9/11/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- NOV 06, 2012 @ 1:30 PM FOR 1/2 DAY AND APPOINTING ATTORNEY KENNETH KROCHMAL AS GAL FOR THE MINOR CHILD HEREIN
7/16/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- AUGUST 22, 2012 @ 2:30PM
5/15/2012
NOTICE OF SUBMISSION
5/2/2012
ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL
4/10/2012
AGREED ORDER
2/21/2012
Order Scheduling Telephone Pretrial Conference/Settlement Conference
1/17/2012
Magistrate's Order
1/17/2012
Order GRANTING Interim Atty Fees
12/1/2011
Request for an oral hearing on the Temporary Order
11/30/2011
Plaintiff's Motion for Restraining Orders
11/30/2011
Entry GRANTING Restraining Orders
11/29/2011
Temporary Order
11/15/2011
Order Scheduling Pretrial Conference /Settlement Conference
11/8/2011
Order scheduling final hearing
11/4/2011
Order Requiring Parties To Attend “Helping Children Succeed After Divorce” Seminar
10/31/2011
For divorce and other relief