Docket History
8/29/2014
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 10/2/2014 @ 1:30 PM
4/9/2012
Magistrate Decision and Permanent Order Adopting Final Judgment and Decree
2/22/2012
ENTRY CONTINUING HEARING DATE
2/15/2012
Order scheduling final hearing
2/9/2012
Entry of appearance as co-counsel for Plaintiff
11/28/2011
Order scheduling final hearing
11/15/2011
Order Requiring Parties To Attend “Helping Children Succeed After Divorce” Seminar
11/3/2011
DIVORCE WITH CHILDREN