Docket History
5/11/2016
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 07/18/2016 @ 9:00 AM
5/11/2016
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 07/18/2016 @ 9:00 AM
5/11/2016
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- 07/18/2016 @ 9:00 AM
5/23/2012
Magistrate Order for Agreed Entry to be filed within 14 days
2/29/2012
Order Scheduling Pretrial Conference /Settlement Conference
2/27/2012
Answer and Counterclaim of Defendant
2/16/2012
ORDER SCHEDULING FINAL HEARING
2/6/2012
Order requiring parties to attend “Helping Children Succeed After Divorce” seminar
1/9/2012
DIVORCE WITH CHILDREN