28038 Cases | Common Pleas Domestic Relations
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2025DM00144 | HOLLY BURGESS | 4/10/2025 | |||||||
Marianne Burgess vs Holly Burgess | |||||||||
2025DM00141 | JAMES MIKOLAJEWSKI | 4/9/2025 | |||||||
Brittany Mikolajewski vs James Mikolajewski | |||||||||
2025DM00142 | BLAKE JACOB CORNN | 4/9/2025 | |||||||
Aerin Micaela Cornn vs Blake Jacob Cornn | |||||||||
2025DR00217 | DURIEL CRENSHAW SR | 4/9/2025 | |||||||
Martia Crenshaw vs Duriel Crenshaw Sr | |||||||||
2025DR00215 | TONYA MARIE YOUNG | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
Keith Alan Young vs Tonya Marie Young | |||||||||
2025DR00216 | REEM NABIL RADWAN | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
Mohamad Rashid El Miaari vs Reem Nabil Radwan | |||||||||
2025DM00138 | DOUGLAS DIDIER | 4/7/2025 | |||||||
Katherine Didier vs Douglas Didier | |||||||||
2025DM00139 | JESSICA MILLER | 4/7/2025 | |||||||
Nancy Miller vs Jessica Miller | |||||||||
2025DM00136 | DANIELLE CARINA GANTNER-COOPER | 4/4/2025 | |||||||
Brian Scott Cooper vs Danielle Carina Gantner-cooper | |||||||||
2025DM00137 | ALEXANDER GERARDO VIQUEZ VALVERDE | 4/4/2025 | |||||||
Autumn Nicole Lamb vs Alexander Gerardo Viquez Valverde | |||||||||
2025DR00208 | JAMES LINDELL SWAIN | 4/4/2025 | |||||||
Schmika Renna Lawhorn vs James Lindell Swain | |||||||||
2025DR00209 | TAKEYA SHARDAE CLEMONS | 4/4/2025 | |||||||
Jazmine Mykia Fears vs Takeya Shardae Clemons | |||||||||
2025DM00135 | BRITTANY SNYDER | 4/3/2025 | |||||||
Tim Snyder vs Brittany Snyder | |||||||||
2025DR00205 | EKAETE INWANG | 4/3/2025 | |||||||
Ronald Eugene Muhammad Individual vs Ekaete Inwang | |||||||||
2025DR00206 | DARNELL WILCOX | 4/3/2025 | |||||||
Staycee Wilcox vs Darnell Wilcox | |||||||||
2025DR00207 | KRISTEN LAMDEN | 4/3/2025 | |||||||
Justin Larrison vs Kristen Lamden | |||||||||
2025DM00133 | RONALD EGBERT | 4/2/2025 | |||||||
Kristina Egbert vs Ronald Egbert | |||||||||
2025DR00202 | CYNTHIA THORNTON | 4/2/2025 | |||||||
James Thornton vs Cynthia Thornton | |||||||||
2025DM00131 | SAMANTHA N RUNYON | 4/1/2025 | |||||||
John H Runyon vs Samantha N Runyon | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6 ... 1400, 1401, 1402 Next |