9398 Cases | Dayton Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
25CVG01655 | STANLEY STRAIGHT AND ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS, ET AL | 4/10/2025 | |||||||
Brian Powell vs Stanley Straight And All Other Occupants, et al | |||||||||
25CVI00445 | 4/9/2025 | ||||||||
Alexander Stewart vs | |||||||||
25CVI00640 | PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE , ET AL | 4/9/2025 | |||||||
Ahmed Mohammed vs Progressive Insurance , et al | |||||||||
25CVI01251 | ANTONIA KNOTTON | 4/9/2025 | |||||||
Lashonna Snowden vs Antonia Knotton | |||||||||
25CVI01289 | PRIMA MANAGEMENT | 4/9/2025 | |||||||
Autumn McKenzie vs Prima Management | |||||||||
25CVI01359 | KINGS MOTORS GROUP, LLC | 4/9/2025 | |||||||
Nathan Gomm vs Kings Motors Group, LLC | |||||||||
25CVI01252 | CRAIGS TRANSMISSION AND AUTO REPAIR | 4/9/2025 | |||||||
Todd Endland/Ascension Assests Fencing LLC vs Craigs Transmission And Auto Repair | |||||||||
24CVF05790 | SUZANNE JOHNSON | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
Citibank vs Suzanne Johnson | |||||||||
22CVF06552 | JEFFREY A HOBSON JR | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
KH Credit Union vs Jeffrey A Hobson Jr | |||||||||
18CVF03475 | ADAM C MANNING | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
Ally Bank vs Adam C Manning | |||||||||
25CVH00024 | ANASTACHIA GUGEON-PEARSON, ET AL | 4/7/2025 | |||||||
Prima Management vs Anastachia Gugeon-Pearson, et al | |||||||||
25CVH01323 | LOVOUD ERNEST WOODRUFF | 4/7/2025 | |||||||
Monarch Mulitfamily vs Lovoud Ernest Woodruff | |||||||||
24CVI04483 | VIVIAN SMITH | 4/7/2025 | |||||||
Howell Smith vs Vivian Smith | |||||||||
25CVG01194 | MARQUISE BENNETT AND ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS | 4/4/2025 | |||||||
Peak 10 Properties, Llc Dba Riverstone Apartments vs MarQuise Bennett and all other o... | |||||||||
25CVG01203 | DEANNA GIBBONS AND ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS | 4/4/2025 | |||||||
Ryan Miller vs Deanna Gibbons and all other occupants | |||||||||
25CVG01195 | KEVON JONES AND ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS | 4/4/2025 | |||||||
Peak 10 Properties, L L C Dba Rockwood Apartments vs Kevon Jones and all other occupa... | |||||||||
25CVG01196 | KAMRYN ROARK AND ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS | 4/4/2025 | |||||||
Peak 10 Properties, Llc Dba Riverstone Apartments vs Kamryn Roark and all other occup... | |||||||||
25CVG01197 | SABINUS OKERE AND ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS | 4/4/2025 | |||||||
Peak 10 Properties Llc, Dba Executive House vs Sabinus Okere and all other occupants | |||||||||
25CVG01198 | NYA MEDALION AND ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS | 4/4/2025 | |||||||
Peak 10 Properties, L L C Dba Rockwood Apartments vs Nya Medalion and all other occup... | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 15, 16, 17 ... 468, 469, 470 Next |