17285 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
24CVF04252 | JAMES BECKNELL | 4/15/2025 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC. LLC vs JAMES BECKNELL | |||||||||
24CVF03485 | JANIYAH M ROSEWAY | 4/15/2025 | |||||||
MYUSA CREDIT UNION INC vs JANIYAH M ROSEWAY | |||||||||
25CVI02353 | S&T TRANSMISSIONS C/O SHAWN WAREING | 4/15/2025 | |||||||
CONNIE SANDERS vs S&T TRANSMISSIONS C/O SHAWN WAREING | |||||||||
24CVF03512 | CASSANDRA GARRETT | 4/15/2025 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. vs CASSANDRA GARRETT | |||||||||
25CVG02551 | RUFUS WILSON JR. | 4/15/2025 | |||||||
MONARCH INVESTMENT & MGMT GROUP, AGENT FOR GK OH APARTMENTS II, L vs RUFUS WILSON Jr. | |||||||||
24CVF04370 | EMILY GAINES | 4/15/2025 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs EMILY GAINES | |||||||||
25CVG02522 | DONNA BROWN, DAWN WYATT, BRIAN WYATT | 4/15/2025 | |||||||
VINEBROOK HOMES, LLC vs DONNA BROWN, DAWN WYATT, BRIAN WYATT | |||||||||
24CVF03147 | QUINTIN NEIHEISEL | 4/14/2025 | |||||||
JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS, P vs QUINTIN NEIHEISEL | |||||||||
24CVF03092 | MICHAEL MOSSBARGER | 4/14/2025 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVER ASSOCIATES, LLC vs MICHAEL MOSSBARGER | |||||||||
25CVF02377 | NICOLE A CLEMMONS | 4/14/2025 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE, N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS, P vs NICOLE A CLEMMONS | |||||||||
25CVF02257 | MICHAEL GRIMM | 4/14/2025 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION, INC vs MICHAEL GRIMM | |||||||||
24CVF04196 | SAED J. KHALED | 4/11/2025 | |||||||
WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. vs SAED J. KHALED | |||||||||
24CVF04410 | TIMOTHY E SOMMER | 4/11/2025 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK vs TIMOTHY E SOMMER | |||||||||
24CVF04604 | COREY A SCHRIER | 4/11/2025 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE , N.A. vs COREY A SCHRIER | |||||||||
24CVF03880 | ASTRYD ELIZABETH RAMOS | 4/11/2025 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs ASTRYD ELIZABETH RAMOS | |||||||||
24CVF03267 | CHARLES E WHITAKER | 4/11/2025 | |||||||
JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. vs CHARLES E WHITAKER | |||||||||
24CVF02975 | TIMIKA BAXTER | 4/10/2025 | |||||||
H & S FINANCIAL, INC vs TIMIKA BAXTER | |||||||||
24CVF03651 | DENNIS KUHN | 4/9/2025 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES vs DENNIS KUHN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 9, 10, 11 ... 863, 864, 865 Next |