17324 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
25CVF02377 | NICOLE A CLEMMONS | 4/14/2025 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE, N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS, P vs NICOLE A CLEMMONS | |||||||||
25CVF02257 | MICHAEL GRIMM | 4/14/2025 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION, INC vs MICHAEL GRIMM | |||||||||
24CVF03880 | ASTRYD ELIZABETH RAMOS | 4/11/2025 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs ASTRYD ELIZABETH RAMOS | |||||||||
24CVF03267 | CHARLES E WHITAKER | 4/11/2025 | |||||||
JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. vs CHARLES E WHITAKER | |||||||||
24CVF04196 | SAED J. KHALED | 4/11/2025 | |||||||
WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. vs SAED J. KHALED | |||||||||
24CVF04410 | TIMOTHY E SOMMER | 4/11/2025 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK vs TIMOTHY E SOMMER | |||||||||
24CVF04604 | COREY A SCHRIER | 4/11/2025 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE , N.A. vs COREY A SCHRIER | |||||||||
24CVF02975 | TIMIKA BAXTER | 4/10/2025 | |||||||
H & S FINANCIAL, INC vs TIMIKA BAXTER | |||||||||
24CVF03651 | DENNIS KUHN | 4/9/2025 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES vs DENNIS KUHN | |||||||||
24CVF02987 | ELIZABETH HANSON | 4/9/2025 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs ELIZABETH HANSON | |||||||||
24CVF03619 | ANTHONY BURTON | 4/9/2025 | |||||||
CAPITAL AUTO CREDIT LLC vs ANTHONY BURTON | |||||||||
24CVF03524 | MATT TURNER | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs MATT TURNER | |||||||||
24CVF03450 | JASON WHALEY | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVER ASSOCIATES LLC vs JASON WHALEY | |||||||||
24CVF03489 | CHARLES COKER | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
DNF ASSOCIATES LLC C/O VELO LAW OFFICE vs CHARLES COKER | |||||||||
25CVG02506 | SAMANTHA SMITH | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
RON WAKER vs SAMANTHA SMITH | |||||||||
25CVL00004 | SODEL TOWNE PROPERTIES | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
S. BRIAN MCBRYDE vs SODEL TOWNE PROPERTIES | |||||||||
25CVG02485 | OLIVIA FRAZIER | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
THE CONNOR GROUP FOR DOVETREE TIC 1 LLC, ET AL 6 vs OLIVIA FRAZIER | |||||||||
25CVL00002 | HUNTLEY RIDGE APARTMENTS ATTN: MALEAH COTTON | 4/8/2025 | |||||||
RICHARD E. SEITZ vs HUNTLEY RIDGE APARTMENTS ATTN: MALEAH COTTON | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 12, 13, 14 ... 865, 866, 867 Next |