11298 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
16CVF02498 | LORI D SPYKER | 9/7/2016 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES ASSET MANAGEMENT CO vs LORI D SPYKER | |||||||||
15CVF03082 | CHRISTOPHER BLAKE EASTERLING | 9/7/2016 | |||||||
RELIABLE CONTRACTORES INC vs CHRISTOPHER BLAKE EASTERLING | |||||||||
16CVF02506 | DAVID W HARSHMAN | 9/6/2016 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC vs DAVID W HARSHMAN | |||||||||
16CVF02451 | NICOLE SPRING | 9/2/2016 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs NICOLE SPRING | |||||||||
16CVF02660 | WILLIAM A MARKSBERRY | 9/1/2016 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs WILLIAM A MARKSBERRY | |||||||||
16CVF02277 | BRIAN J CONNOLLY | 8/31/2016 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs BRIAN J CONNOLLY | |||||||||
16CVF02585 | SHANDA MORAN-CANNON | 8/31/2016 | |||||||
OCMAC LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES LLC vs SHANDA MORAN-CANNON | |||||||||
15CVF02347 | TIFFANY REDICK | 8/31/2016 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs TIFFANY REDICK | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 531, 532, 533 ... 563, 564, 565 Next |