11298 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
15CVF02557 | DUSTIN KETRING | 8/12/2016 | |||||||
PCA ACQUISITIONS V, LLC C/O KIRSCHENBAUM, PHILLIPS & LEV vs DUSTIN KETRING | |||||||||
16CVF02555 | LATEFA R FARMER | 8/11/2016 | |||||||
YANKEE DENTAL vs LATEFA R FARMER | |||||||||
16CVI02550 | BRIAN MALONEY | 8/10/2016 | |||||||
JESSICA LINGER vs BRIAN MALONEY | |||||||||
15CVG02334 | JEFF HAMMOND | 8/9/2016 | |||||||
CORNERSTONE-KETTERING PROPERTIES LTD vs JEFF HAMMOND | |||||||||
16CVF02386 | TAMI BUSCH | 8/8/2016 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs TAMI BUSCH | |||||||||
16CVF02425 | MARY GEORGE | 8/8/2016 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs MARY GEORGE | |||||||||
16CVF02427 | JON D THUERMER | 8/8/2016 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs JON D THUERMER | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 538, 539, 540 ... 563, 564, 565 Next |