11298 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
16CVF02427 | JON D THUERMER | 8/8/2016 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs JON D THUERMER | |||||||||
16CVF02468 | KARMA THOMAS | 8/8/2016 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs KARMA THOMAS | |||||||||
16CVF02446 | MITCHELL T GARDNER II | 8/5/2016 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O ZWICKER & ASSOC, P.C. vs MITCHELL T GARDNER II | |||||||||
16CVF02263 | HOPE GOLDSMITH | 8/3/2016 | |||||||
PALMERA C/O HILLS vs HOPE GOLDSMITH | |||||||||
16CVF02317 | SAM HOLLYFIELD | 8/3/2016 | |||||||
VILLAGER vs SAM HOLLYFIELD | |||||||||
15CVG02805 | SHERECE ZACHERY | 8/3/2016 | |||||||
THIRTY 43 BY THE GREENE vs SHERECE ZACHERY | |||||||||
16CVF02522 | ROBIN MCKEEN | 8/2/2016 | |||||||
GREENMONT MUTUAL HOUSING CORPORA vs ROBIN MCKEEN | |||||||||
16CVF02455 | KURT HENKALINE | 8/1/2016 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs KURT HENKALINE | |||||||||
15CVF02296 | DERRICK MOSS | 8/1/2016 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC C/O LEVY AND ASSOCIATES, LLC vs DERRICK MOSS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 539, 540, 541 ... 563, 564, 565 Next |