12279 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
23CVF02094 | CASEY ALLEN TURNER | 5/28/2024 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA N.A. vs CASEY ALLEN TURNER | |||||||||
23CVF03479 | TIFFINY M HARRIS | 5/27/2024 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO vs TIFFINY M HARRIS | |||||||||
24CVF02500 | JAMES GRIDLEY | 5/27/2024 | |||||||
OKINUS INC vs JAMES GRIDLEY | |||||||||
24CVF02346 | DESTINY MCCLOSKEY | 5/24/2024 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs DESTINY MCCLOSKEY | |||||||||
24CVF02262 | MANFRED JAHNKE | 5/24/2024 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs MANFRED JAHNKE | |||||||||
24CVI02365 | AUTO-X-10'D | 5/23/2024 | |||||||
KENNETH J FAULKS Sr. vs auto-X-10'D | |||||||||
23CVF03627 | TROY GANTE | 5/23/2024 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES LLC vs TROY GANTE | |||||||||
24CVF02109 | TODD HINDERS | 5/23/2024 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE, LLC vs TODD HINDERS | |||||||||
23CVF03974 | JACK SMALLEY | 5/23/2024 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES LLC vs JACK SMALLEY | |||||||||
23CVF04046 | KELLI HALES | 5/23/2024 | |||||||
FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs KELLI HALES | |||||||||
CVG2400442 | MCDONALD, ROBERT AND GUTIERREZ, ANTHONY | 4/2/2024 | |||||||
SL FLATS OWNER LLC vs MCDONALD, ROBERT and GUTIERREZ, ANTHONY | |||||||||
CVF2301607 | TYREE, JENNIFER N AND THOMPSON, ERICA | 4/2/2024 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs TYREE, JENNIFER N and THOMPSON, ERICA | |||||||||
CVG2400413 | KING, NIKKI | 4/2/2024 | |||||||
QUARRY LAKES MHP LLC vs KING, NIKKI | |||||||||
CVF2300785 | SCHROCK, HENRY AND GUTIERREZ, ANTHONY | 4/2/2024 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs SCHROCK, HENRY and GUTIERREZ, ANTHONY | |||||||||
CVG2400415 | MUSTAFA, RAMI AND KITSON, SARAH | 4/2/2024 | |||||||
QUARRY LAKES MHP LLC vs MUSTAFA, RAMI and KITSON, SARAH | |||||||||
CVG2400450 | JOHNSON, CHRISTINA AND GRONKA, WILLIAM | 4/2/2024 | |||||||
MORGAN PROPERTIES INC vs JOHNSON, CHRISTINA and GRONKA, WILLIAM | |||||||||
CVG2400448 | SNOWDEN DAVIS, LACRETIA AND GUTIERREZ, ANTHONY | 4/2/2024 | |||||||
PEDCOR INVESTMENTS 1006 XXVI vs SNOWDEN DAVIS, LACRETIA and GUTIERREZ, ANTHONY | |||||||||
CVF2400087 | LEWIS, CANDITA AND THOMPSON, ERICA | 4/2/2024 | |||||||
VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC vs LEWIS, CANDITA and THOMPSON, ERICA | |||||||||
CVG2400425 | PENNACHIO, RENEE AND GUTIERREZ, ANTHONY | 4/2/2024 | |||||||
SL FLATS OWNER LLC vs PENNACHIO, RENEE and GUTIERREZ, ANTHONY | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 14, 15, 16 ... 612, 613, 614 Next |