11310 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
14CVF01590 | AARON SONNENBURG | 12/8/2014 | |||||||
SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF OHIO, INC. vs AARON SONNENBURG | |||||||||
14CVF01434 | SHERYL MCDONALD | 12/5/2014 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs SHERYL MCDONALD | |||||||||
14CVI01597 | AUTO CONNECTION | 12/2/2014 | |||||||
KATRINA R. LEAK vs AUTO CONNECTION | |||||||||
14CVF01477 | MINH T. NGUYEN | 11/21/2014 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O CHEEK LAW OFFICES LLC vs MINH T. NGUYEN | |||||||||
14CVF01479 | BIRAHIMA KANE | 11/21/2014 | |||||||
CACH, LLC vs BIRAHIMA KANE | |||||||||
14CVF01429 | AMIA HAWES | 11/21/2014 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O DB SERVICING CORPORATION vs AMIA HAWES | |||||||||
14CVF01368 | ROBERT SHADE | 11/21/2014 | |||||||
FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES LLC vs ROBERT SHADE | |||||||||
14CVF01282 | MIRANDA BRIGHT | 11/21/2014 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O DB SERVICING CORPORATION vs MIRANDA BRIGHT | |||||||||
14CVF01175 | SCOTT W. FRANER | 11/21/2014 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA vs SCOTT W. FRANER | |||||||||
14CVF01164 | KEVIN TURNER | 11/21/2014 | |||||||
GREATER DAYTON SURGERY CENTER vs KEVIN TURNER | |||||||||
14CVF01016 | MELANIE MARTIN | 11/21/2014 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP vs MELANIE MARTIN | |||||||||
14CVF00977 | JACOB STUART | 11/21/2014 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs JACOB STUART | |||||||||
14CVE01464 | JENNIFER M. BAKER | 11/20/2014 | |||||||
NATIONWIDE MUTUAL FIRE INS.CO. A/S/O JAMES AND SUSAN MCKINNEY vs JENNIFER M. BAKER | |||||||||
14CVF00910 | ALLEENE B WILEY | 11/20/2014 | |||||||
CITIBANK, NA SUCCESSOR TO CITIBANK (SOUTH DAK vs ALLEENE B WILEY | |||||||||
14CVF00948 | SHAMARI K. TREADWELL | 11/20/2014 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) , NA vs SHAMARI K. TREADWELL | |||||||||
14CVF01140 | JESSE RUSSELL | 11/20/2014 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs JESSE RUSSELL | |||||||||
14CVF01291 | THOMAS SMITH | 11/20/2014 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs THOMAS SMITH | |||||||||
14CVF01302 | STEVEN K BERNHARD | 11/20/2014 | |||||||
WRIGHT PATT CREDIT UNION vs STEVEN K BERNHARD | |||||||||
14CVF01427 | REGINA M. BREWER | 11/20/2014 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O DB SERVICING CORPORATION vs REGINA M. BREWER | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 556, 557, 558 ... 564, 565, 566 Next |