11310 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
14CVF00786 | TERESA MILLER | 10/31/2014 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs TERESA MILLER | |||||||||
14CVF00788 | CLIFFORD DENNIS | 10/31/2014 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs CLIFFORD DENNIS | |||||||||
14CVF00764 | MELISSA NEAL | 10/31/2014 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs MELISSA NEAL | |||||||||
14CVF00424 | MELISSA DAVIS | 10/30/2014 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC vs MELISSA DAVIS | |||||||||
14CVF00425 | BRIAN BRUNNER | 10/30/2014 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC vs BRIAN BRUNNER | |||||||||
14CVF01192 | DAVE SALMON | 10/27/2014 | |||||||
SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF OHIO, INC. vs DAVE SALMON | |||||||||
03CVF00623 | CHRISTI COUCH | 10/24/2014 | |||||||
SEAWEST FINANCIAL CORP vs CHRISTI COUCH | |||||||||
14CVF01335 | LAUREN MACKENZIE | 10/24/2014 | |||||||
TOYOTA MOTOR CREDIT CORP vs LAUREN MACKENZIE | |||||||||
14CVI01345 | DEBBIE BUSCHUR | 10/21/2014 | |||||||
SCHENCK FURNITURE AND APPLIANCES INC. vs DEBBIE BUSCHUR | |||||||||
14CVI01348 | GARY GROFF C/O GROFF AUTO GROUP | 10/21/2014 | |||||||
SCHENCK FURNITURE AND APPLIANCES vs GARY GROFF C/O GROFF AUTO GROUP | |||||||||
14CVF01428 | CYNTHIA A. HABEGGER | 10/21/2014 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O DB SERVICING CORPORATION vs CYNTHIA A. HABEGGER | |||||||||
14CVF01425 | PAUL A. KILBY | 10/21/2014 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA vs PAUL A. KILBY | |||||||||
14CVF00069 | KALLEB D. MCDOWELL | 10/20/2014 | |||||||
BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE vs KALLEB D. MCDOWELL | |||||||||
14CVF00767 | ALI M. ABUAMREH | 10/20/2014 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs ALI M. ABUAMREH | |||||||||
14CVF00795 | JUAN C RAMOS | 10/20/2014 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs JUAN C RAMOS | |||||||||
14CVF00796 | JONATHAN M THOMPSON | 10/20/2014 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs JONATHAN M THOMPSON | |||||||||
14CVF00812 | AMANDA LYNCH | 10/20/2014 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPANCE CORPORATION vs AMANDA LYNCH | |||||||||
14CVF00869 | JOSHUA J HALL | 10/20/2014 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs JOSHUA J HALL | |||||||||
14CVF00908 | WILLIAM T LUSTER JR | 10/20/2014 | |||||||
SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF OHIO, INC. vs WILLIAM T LUSTER JR | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 559, 560, 561 ... 564, 565, 566 Next |