11310 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
14CVF01333 | MARKITA BEDFORD | 10/20/2014 | |||||||
KETTERING HEALTH NETWORK CREDIT UNION vs MARKITA BEDFORD | |||||||||
96CVF08007 | AARON N. JEWETT | 10/17/2014 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANC CORP. vs AARON N. JEWETT | |||||||||
14CVG00022 | DONNA THOMPSON, ET AL | 10/17/2014 | |||||||
ORPHEUS L GARRISON vs DONNA THOMPSON, ET AL | |||||||||
14CVG00206 | DEBRA ROBERTS, ET AL | 10/17/2014 | |||||||
ORPHEUS L GARRISON vs DEBRA ROBERTS, ET AL | |||||||||
14CVI01287 | AMERICAN HOMES 4 RENT | 10/16/2014 | |||||||
HEATHER TALLET vs AMERICAN HOMES 4 RENT | |||||||||
14CVI01339 | KATHY J. LAMBERT | 10/15/2014 | |||||||
WILLIAM M AYLES SR vs KATHY J. LAMBERT | |||||||||
03CVH01973 | PAUL A GOLDEN | 10/15/2014 | |||||||
PALISADES ACQUISITION XVI LLC vs PAUL A GOLDEN | |||||||||
14CVG00656 | AMANDA SALLY, ET AL. | 10/15/2014 | |||||||
KATHY LAMBERT vs AMANDA SALLY, ET AL. | |||||||||
14CVG00529 | RODGER GOTTHARDT | 10/15/2014 | |||||||
ED BOCOCK vs RODGER GOTTHARDT | |||||||||
14CVF00499 | NANCY J HARRIS | 10/15/2014 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA vs NANCY J HARRIS | |||||||||
14CVF00407 | NEELY HAWKINS | 10/15/2014 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs NEELY HAWKINS | |||||||||
14CVF00345 | KENNETH GILL | 10/14/2014 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs KENNETH GILL | |||||||||
14CVF00946 | R.K. CONSTRUCTION, INC. RANDY D. KING, STAT AGENT | 10/14/2014 | |||||||
ROOFTEK ROOFING SUPPLIES, INC. vs R.K. CONSTRUCTION, INC. RANDY D. KING, STAT AGENT | |||||||||
14CVF01001 | LINDA M COLAS | 10/14/2014 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs LINDA M COLAS | |||||||||
14CVH01516 | MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR | 10/14/2014 | |||||||
JESSICA A KNIGHT vs MIKE RANKIN REGISTRAR | |||||||||
14CVF01012 | CAROLYN ALCORN | 10/13/2014 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs CAROLYN ALCORN | |||||||||
14CVF01177 | SUSAN K CLARK | 10/13/2014 | |||||||
COMPETITIVE EDGE ATHLETICS, INC vs SUSAN K CLARK | |||||||||
14CVG00120 | MICHAEL LINVILLE | 10/9/2014 | |||||||
RONIULLO BARBECHO AND JAMIR BARBECHO vs MICHAEL LINVILLE | |||||||||
14CVG00058 | PAUL NEFF | 10/7/2014 | |||||||
PAG HOLDINGS, LTD. vs PAUL NEFF | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 560, 561, 562 ... 564, 565, 566 Next |