11310 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
14CVI01285 | WALID SHALSH | 9/30/2014 | |||||||
PET FUR, LLC vs WALID SHALSH | |||||||||
14CVI01265 | SHAWN MAYNARD | 9/30/2014 | |||||||
SOUTHTOWN HEATING & COOLING INC. vs SHAWN MAYNARD | |||||||||
14CVF00389 | NANCY J HARRIS | 9/26/2014 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA RECOVERIES PMO - LEGAL vs NANCY J HARRIS | |||||||||
14CVF00577 | TRVLYN J MATTA | 9/24/2014 | |||||||
LEBANON EQUINE CLINIC, INC vs TRVLYN J MATTA | |||||||||
14CVG01020 | VASTARIA NICKELL, ET AL | 9/23/2014 | |||||||
GERALD D. SHUMAKER vs VASTARIA NICKELL, ET AL | |||||||||
14CVI01222 | JILL HEFFNER | 9/23/2014 | |||||||
DOUR PRINTING & OFFICE SUPPLIES vs JILL HEFFNER | |||||||||
14CVF00938 | RUSSELL TOLEN | 9/19/2014 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DB IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs RUSSELL TOLEN | |||||||||
14CVF01014 | RANDALL NEAL | 9/19/2014 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs RANDALL NEAL | |||||||||
14CVF01025 | COURTNEY L. BYRD | 9/18/2014 | |||||||
RAB PERFORMANCE RECOVERIES LLC SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO vs COURTNEY L. BYRD | |||||||||
14CVF01054 | RYAN STILWELL | 9/17/2014 | |||||||
AUTOVEST, LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOC, LLC vs RYAN STILWELL | |||||||||
14CVI01017 | CHARLES A WADE | 9/17/2014 | |||||||
JOY M SHACKELFORD vs CHARLES A WADE | |||||||||
14CVF00837 | JUSTIN BOOSO | 9/17/2014 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA vs JUSTIN BOOSO | |||||||||
14CVF00578 | MIRANDA MCINTOSH | 9/16/2014 | |||||||
LEBANON EQUINE CLINIC, INC vs MIRANDA MCINTOSH | |||||||||
14CVF00638 | ADALINA S. RIVERA | 9/16/2014 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs ADALINA S. RIVERA | |||||||||
14CVF00731 | VERA F BOZEMAN | 9/16/2014 | |||||||
SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF OHIO, INC. vs VERA F BOZEMAN | |||||||||
14CVF00822 | JOHNNY M. CUNNINGHAM | 9/16/2014 | |||||||
CARROLLTON POINTE APTS vs JOHNNY M. CUNNINGHAM | |||||||||
14CVF00602 | APRIL FLINT | 9/15/2014 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO MIDLAND FUNDING DE vs APRIL FLINT | |||||||||
14CVF01046 | CAMPBELL CONSTRUCTION SOLUTION | 9/15/2014 | |||||||
AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE CO vs CAMPBELL CONSTRUCTION SOLUTION | |||||||||
14CVF01144 | VICKI B LAKE | 9/15/2014 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA vs VICKI B LAKE | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 562, 563, 564, 565, 566 Next |