11310 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
14CVF00703 | KAREN M BARNHART | 9/11/2014 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs KAREN M BARNHART | |||||||||
14CVF00713 | ABDELWAHED M SABRY | 9/11/2014 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs ABDELWAHED M SABRY | |||||||||
14CVF01109 | JOSIE L. GILBERT | 9/11/2014 | |||||||
BRINKLEY PROPERTIES, LTD. vs JOSIE L. GILBERT | |||||||||
14CVF00644 | RAY S. RUSSELL | 9/11/2014 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs RAY S. RUSSELL | |||||||||
05CVF01402 | TYIER J JONES | 9/10/2014 | |||||||
H & S FINANCIAL INC vs TYIER J JONES | |||||||||
06CVH01124 | MARIANNA CONLEY | 9/10/2014 | |||||||
TD BANK USA NA AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST vs MARIANNA CONLEY | |||||||||
14CVH01327 | MIKE RANKIN, REG | 9/8/2014 | |||||||
JOSEPH CRIPPS vs MIKE RANKIN, REG | |||||||||
13CVE01814 | DAVID WOLFE SR | 9/4/2014 | |||||||
WESTFIELD NATIONAL INS CO. AS SUBROGEE OF MARK BALSAN vs DAVID WOLFE SR | |||||||||
14CVF01151 | JESSICA POWELL | 9/4/2014 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DB IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE LL vs JESSICA POWELL | |||||||||
14CVF01104 | JESSICA A. BACK | 9/3/2014 | |||||||
SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF OHIO, INC. vs JESSICA A. BACK | |||||||||
14CVF01051 | HOLLY J. BUSSELL | 9/3/2014 | |||||||
GREATER DAYTON SURGERY CENTER vs HOLLY J. BUSSELL | |||||||||
14CVF01049 | ANGELA LILLY | 9/3/2014 | |||||||
SPRINGLEAF FINANCIAL SERVICES OF vs ANGELA LILLY | |||||||||
14CVF00956 | AMBER SIVAK | 9/3/2014 | |||||||
MSW CAPITAL, LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs AMBER SIVAK | |||||||||
14CVF00831 | ROBERT L WHITMAN | 9/3/2014 | |||||||
NORTH DAYTON PATHOLOGISTS INC vs ROBERT L WHITMAN | |||||||||
14CVF00709 | JESSICA G. BLEDSOE | 9/3/2014 | |||||||
ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE SPEC F C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs JESSICA G. BLE... | |||||||||
14CVF00706 | EVERETT A. MCCAULEY | 9/3/2014 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs EVERETT A. MCCAULEY | |||||||||
14CVF00690 | BRIAN E. LAINHART | 9/3/2014 | |||||||
STERLING JEWELERS INC. T/A JARED-GALLERIA OF JEWELRY vs BRIAN E. LAINHART | |||||||||
14CVF00586 | AMY J. ANTICOLI | 9/3/2014 | |||||||
FIA CARD SERVICES, N.A. C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES vs AMY J. ANTICOLI | |||||||||
14CVE00541 | S. BENJANIM KREITZER | 9/3/2014 | |||||||
ERIE INSURANCE CO vs S. BENJANIM KREITZER | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 563, 564, 565, 566 Next |