17778 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVG2500393 | WILLIAMS, CHARLET | 2/27/2025 | |||||||
ROLLER, JASON vs WILLIAMS, CHARLET | |||||||||
CVG2500394 | ANGEL, VANESSA | 2/27/2025 | |||||||
MANDARIN APARTMENTS LLC vs ANGEL, VANESSA | |||||||||
CVG2500391 | DILLINGHAM, JORDAN | 2/26/2025 | |||||||
MCKENZIE, DELIA vs DILLINGHAM, JORDAN | |||||||||
CVF2500390 | WHITEHEAD, CHARLES | 2/26/2025 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs WHITEHEAD, CHARLES | |||||||||
CVI2500392 | HUTCHINSON, KRISTYN M | 2/26/2025 | |||||||
GUNNOE, GERALD E. vs HUTCHINSON, KRISTYN M | |||||||||
CVG2500384 | MATLOCK, MICHELE | 2/25/2025 | |||||||
AGORA'S MAXXED OUT REALTY, LLC vs MATLOCK, MICHELE | |||||||||
CVG2500385 | LEATHLEY, JESSICA MAY | 2/25/2025 | |||||||
JENKINS, MARK vs LEATHLEY, JESSICA MAY | |||||||||
CVG2500386 | BYRD, JOHN | 2/25/2025 | |||||||
BRG REALTY GROUP, LLC vs BYRD, JOHN | |||||||||
CVG2500387 | KELLER, ASHELY | 2/25/2025 | |||||||
MORGAN PROPERTIES INC vs KELLER, ASHELY | |||||||||
CVG2500388 | ATENCIO, JESSICA | 2/25/2025 | |||||||
FOXHOLE86/IDEAL NORTH MHC vs ATENCIO, JESSICA | |||||||||
CVI2500389 | FAROOQ, EHTASHAM | 2/25/2025 | |||||||
MARINELLI, JOSPEH vs FAROOQ, EHTASHAM | |||||||||
CVE2500383 | SCHANDER, KENNETH | 2/24/2025 | |||||||
STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTO INS CO vs SCHANDER, KENNETH | |||||||||
CVF2500382 | GORDON, ANDREW | 2/24/2025 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs GORDON, ANDREW | |||||||||
CVF2500381 | MOTLEY, TAMEEKA | 2/24/2025 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs MOTLEY, TAMEEKA | |||||||||
CVG2500380 | CAMPBELL, JEFFREY L. | 2/24/2025 | |||||||
BRIDGESTREAM PROPERTY MGMT. vs CAMPBELL, JEFFREY L. | |||||||||
CVG2500374 | BROWN, SHENQUNIA | 2/21/2025 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES INC vs BROWN, SHENQUNIA | |||||||||
CVF2500371 | JACKSON, KRISTI | 2/21/2025 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs JACKSON, KRISTI | |||||||||
CVH2500372 | CHARLES NORMAN, REGISTRAR | 2/21/2025 | |||||||
BOTT, EMILEE vs CHARLES NORMAN, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
CVG2500373 | BONNER, CARLENA | 2/21/2025 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES INC vs BONNER, CARLENA | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 23, 24, 25 ... 887, 888, 889 Next |