17778 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF2500255 | BUSKIRK, JANET | 2/7/2025 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK vs BUSKIRK, JANET | |||||||||
CVF2500254 | EWING, ANDREW C | 2/7/2025 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE NA vs EWING, ANDREW C | |||||||||
CVG2500240 | TURNER, BRANDY | 2/6/2025 | |||||||
SUNDANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT L vs TURNER, BRANDY | |||||||||
CVF2500241 | ROSE, STEVE | 2/6/2025 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP vs ROSE, STEVE | |||||||||
CVG2500242 | WALKER, KIMBERLY | 2/6/2025 | |||||||
FOCUS PM LLC vs WALKER, KIMBERLY | |||||||||
CVF2500243 | DEBRILL, JANAY | 2/6/2025 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP vs DEBRILL, JANAY | |||||||||
CVG2500237 | MCGUIRE, STEVE | 2/5/2025 | |||||||
7G BEACHLER, LLC vs MCGUIRE, STEVE | |||||||||
CVH2500238 | CHARLES NORMAN REGISTRAR | 2/5/2025 | |||||||
EDWARDS, KYREN JAVON JR vs CHARLES NORMAN REGISTRAR | |||||||||
CVF2500239 | MATHEWS, LONNIE D | 2/5/2025 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs MATHEWS, LONNIE D | |||||||||
CVF2500210 | UNGER, PATRICIA | 2/4/2025 | |||||||
CETERIS PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC vs UNGER, PATRICIA | |||||||||
CVG2500236 | WERRA, CHAD | 2/4/2025 | |||||||
EMUNAH REALTY, LLC vs WERRA, CHAD | |||||||||
CVG2500235 | HOUSE OF RESTORATION MEDICAL | 2/4/2025 | |||||||
ACADIA MAD RIVER PROPERTY, LLC vs HOUSE OF RESTORATION MEDICAL | |||||||||
CVE2500211 | THOMAS, DYLAN JAMES | 2/4/2025 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs THOMAS, DYLAN JAMES | |||||||||
CVF2500209 | LEWIS, DONAVAN K. | 2/4/2025 | |||||||
VIVE FINANCIAL vs LEWIS, DONAVAN K. | |||||||||
CVG2500205 | LOVEJOY, KILEY | 2/3/2025 | |||||||
MONARCH INVESTMENT & MGMT GRP vs LOVEJOY, KILEY | |||||||||
CVG2500206 | ASH, JEFFERY | 2/3/2025 | |||||||
AGORA'S MAXXED OUT REALTY LLC vs ASH, JEFFERY | |||||||||
CVG2500207 | BURTON, ANTHONY L. | 2/3/2025 | |||||||
FIRST REALTY GROUP, INC vs BURTON, ANTHONY L. | |||||||||
CVG2500208 | HARBER, NIKOLAI | 2/3/2025 | |||||||
HARBER, CHRISTINA vs HARBER, NIKOLAI | |||||||||
CVF2500213 | BARDUA, LYDIA | 2/3/2025 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK vs BARDUA, LYDIA | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 33, 34, 35 ... 887, 888, 889 Next |