17805 Cases | Miamisburg Municipal New Suits
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
CVF2500229 | JONESCAMPBELL, ROBIN | 2/3/2025 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE NA vs JONESCAMPBELL, ROBIN | |||||||||
CVF2500230 | SIZEMORE, TYLER | 2/3/2025 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES vs SIZEMORE, TYLER | |||||||||
CVF2500231 | VARGAS, DANIELLE M | 2/3/2025 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE NA vs VARGAS, DANIELLE M | |||||||||
CVF2500232 | JIMENEZ, LOURDES | 2/3/2025 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs JIMENEZ, LOURDES | |||||||||
CVF2500233 | HANSON, THOMAS | 2/3/2025 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs HANSON, THOMAS | |||||||||
CVF2500234 | KERNS, LAUREN | 2/3/2025 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, vs KERNS, LAUREN | |||||||||
CVF2500228 | HUGHES, RYAN C | 2/3/2025 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE NA vs HUGHES, RYAN C | |||||||||
CVF2500203 | TERRELL,TAMARA | 1/30/2025 | |||||||
CREDITACCEPTANCECORPORATION vs TERRELL,TAMARA | |||||||||
CVF2500204 | SMITH,MICHAELL | 1/30/2025 | |||||||
CKSPRIMEINVESTMENTS,LLC vs SMITH,MICHAELL | |||||||||
CVG2500200 | KELLER,ASHELY | 1/29/2025 | |||||||
MORGANPROPERTIESINC vs KELLER,ASHELY | |||||||||
CVF2500202 | KRAMER,ROBERTM. | 1/29/2025 | |||||||
ROGERS&GREENBERGL.L.P. vs KRAMER,ROBERTM. | |||||||||
CVG2500201 | HAMMEL,SCOTT | 1/29/2025 | |||||||
VINEBROOKHOMES,LLC vs HAMMEL,SCOTT | |||||||||
CVI2500199 | INSURANCE,GRANGE | 1/29/2025 | |||||||
SMITH,TYB vs INSURANCE,GRANGE | |||||||||
CVF2500196 | DAVIS,AMY | 1/28/2025 | |||||||
VELOCITYINVESTMENTS,LLC vs DAVIS,AMY | |||||||||
CVG2500197 | COLLOPY,JUDY | 1/28/2025 | |||||||
SUNHOMESERVICES,INC vs COLLOPY,JUDY | |||||||||
CVG2500198 | DOERR,KENNETH | 1/28/2025 | |||||||
SUNHOMESERVICES,INC vs DOERR,KENNETH | |||||||||
CVG2500182 | YOUNG,JARED | 1/27/2025 | |||||||
MORGANPROPERTIESINC vs YOUNG,JARED | |||||||||
CVG2500183 | SHAW,KENYATTA | 1/27/2025 | |||||||
MORGANPROPERTIESINC vs SHAW,KENYATTA | |||||||||
CVF2500184 | GAYHEART,KATHY | 1/27/2025 | |||||||
MIDLANDCREDITMANGEMENT,INC vs GAYHEART,KATHY | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 36, 37, 38 ... 889, 890, 891 Next |