19788 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2024EST02422 | THE ESTATE OF KEVIN RATLIFF | 2/11/2025 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00172 | THE ESTATE OF JANET WILLIAMSON | 2/11/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02285 | THE ESTATE OF JACQUELYN WILLIAMS | 2/11/2025 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00230 | THE ESTATE OF JEFFREY CASTLE | 2/11/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00214 | THE ESTATE OF JANICE NEIDERMAN | 2/10/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00135 | THE ESTATE OF VELVET HAFER | 2/10/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02155 | THE ESTATE OF VEDA ECKHART | 2/10/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00238 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM LYNCH | 2/10/2025 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00106 | THE ESTATE OF MARY MARCUS | 2/7/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00206 | THE ESTATE OF EVELYN BERGMANN | 2/7/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00218 | THE ESTATE OF GLORIA DENNIS | 2/7/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00184 | THE ESTATE OF ROBERT IRWIN | 2/7/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00209 | THE ESTATE OF PANAGIOTES ZOIS | 2/6/2025 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00124 | THE ESTATE OF PHYLLIS HUBBS | 2/5/2025 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01965 | THE ESTATE OF THOMAS ALLEN | 2/5/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00185 | THE ESTATE OF LULA GARDNER | 2/5/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01877 | THE ESTATE OF JACQUELINE HEMAN | 2/5/2025 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00163 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES HASSLER | 2/4/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02370 | THE ESTATE OF JOHN HUFF | 2/4/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 6, 7, 8 ... 988, 989, 990 Next |