19789 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2025EST00086 | THE ESTATE OF KIMBERLY BARROWS | 2/3/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00119 | THE ESTATE OF HAZEL COOK | 2/3/2025 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00090 | THE ESTATE OF BEATRICE MARTIN - PAGE | 2/3/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00052 | THE ESTATE OF PHYLLIS WALKER | 1/29/2025 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00141 | THE ESTATE OF DONALD LEACH | 1/29/2025 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01937 | THE ESTATE OF PETER BOYLE JR | 1/28/2025 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00069 | THE ESTATE OF ANTHONY KINNISON | 1/28/2025 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00131 | THE ESTATE OF JOSHUA HENSCHEL | 1/28/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00045 | THE ESTATE OF JENNIFER NICORA | 1/24/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00019 | THE ESTATE OF PATRICIA JONES | 1/24/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00095 | THE ESTATE OF CAROLYN PURNHAGEN | 1/24/2025 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00055 | THE ESTATE OF JOE NELSON | 1/24/2025 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02208 | THE ESTATE OF DEBORAH DAILEY | 1/23/2025 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00083 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM ACKERMAN, SR. | 1/17/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00015 | THE ESTATE OF GERALDINE WILLIAMS | 1/17/2025 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00051 | THE ESTATE OF ARLENE HEISLE | 1/15/2025 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00071 | THE ESTATE OF LINDA HUGHLEY | 1/15/2025 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02060 | THE ESTATE OF STEVEN MULLINS | 1/15/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01568 | THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL SHERMAN | 1/14/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 7, 8, 9 ... 988, 989, 990 Next |