19788 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2012EST00866 | THE ESTATE OF KENNETH WELCH | 5/1/2012 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2012EST00756 | THE ESTATE OF GEORGE STAMPER | 4/30/2012 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2012EST00847 | THE ESTATE OF ALMA WHITESCARVER | 4/30/2012 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2012EST00856 | THE ESTATE OF STANLEY LAIRMORE | 4/30/2012 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL | |||||||||
2012EST00574 | THE ESTATE OF SHARON THALLS | 4/30/2012 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2012EST00851 | THE ESTATE OF FRED LARUE | 4/30/2012 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2012EST00852 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES JONES | 4/30/2012 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2012EST00886 | THE ESTATE OF DAVID CAMP, JR. | 4/30/2012 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL | |||||||||
2012EST00846 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM SCHMIDT | 4/27/2012 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2012EST00853 | THE ESTATE OF KIMBERLY DYE | 4/27/2012 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2012EST00843 | THE ESTATE OF ROBERT BAKER | 4/26/2012 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2008GRD00090 | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF NANCY MORTON | 4/26/2012 | |||||||
GRD: SUCCESSOR LIFE ESSENTIALS-INDIGENT | |||||||||
2012EST00837 | THE ESTATE OF WALTER FIDDER JR. | 4/26/2012 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2012EST00804 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES WHITE | 4/26/2012 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL | |||||||||
2011EST00070 | THE ESTATE OF BETTY WADE | 4/26/2012 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN NO WILL | |||||||||
2012GRD00117 | THE GUARDIANSHIP OF HUNTER BREITENSTEIN | 4/26/2012 | |||||||
GRD: MINOR INJURY SETTLEMENT NO GUARDIANSHIP | |||||||||
2012EST00829 | THE ESTATE OF KENNETH TODD | 4/25/2012 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2012EST00830 | THE ESTATE OF ADDIE SHELTON | 4/25/2012 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
2012EST00833 | THE ESTATE OF CLARA POHLAR | 4/25/2012 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN WITH WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 983, 984, 985 ... 988, 989, 990 Next |