19801 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2024EST02249 | THE ESTATE OF VIRGINIA BROWN | 12/3/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02207 | THE ESTATE OF JOHN FERGUSON JR | 12/2/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02195 | THE ESTATE OF ROBERT MASON | 12/2/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02280 | THE ESTATE OF JOHN HICKEY | 12/2/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02253 | THE ESTATE OF MARK BALLING | 11/26/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02092 | THE ESTATE OF ANNABELL BONNEAU | 11/26/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01863 | THE ESTATE OF DAVID DONOVAN | 11/25/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02165 | THE ESTATE OF JOHN GLASER | 11/25/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02109 | THE ESTATE OF CARL WOOLENS | 11/25/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02201 | THE ESTATE OF LURINE TASTE | 11/22/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02245 | THE ESTATE OF REGINA WHITE | 11/22/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02191 | THE ESTATE OF THOMAS VIERS | 11/21/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02161 | THE ESTATE OF ANN SCHROER | 11/21/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02211 | THE ESTATE OF DEBORAH MCKNIGHT | 11/20/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02225 | THE ESTATE OF ALISA BRITTON | 11/20/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 12, 13, 14 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |