19807 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2024EST02004 | THE ESTATE OF CHARLES BANTNER | 11/13/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02102 | THE ESTATE OF VERNICE COSBY | 11/6/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02051 | THE ESTATE OF RUBY JACKSON | 11/4/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01993 | THE ESTATE OF CASSIUS BLACKMON | 11/4/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02044 | THE ESTATE OF MARILYN MAYS | 11/4/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02132 | THE ESTATE OF DARYL TURNER | 11/1/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01988 | THE ESTATE OF JOSEPH GUTH | 11/1/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01551 | THE ESTATE OF MONIQUE CHRISTIAN | 11/1/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02093 | THE ESTATE OF CLIFFORD SMITH, JR. | 11/1/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01160 | THE ESTATE OF SLYVIA ERBECK | 11/1/2024 | |||||||
EST: OTHER | |||||||||
2024EST02053 | THE ESTATE OF ROBERT JOHNSON | 11/1/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02083 | THE ESTATE OF ARNOLD MARTIN | 11/1/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02015 | THE ESTATE OF GERALD HYPES | 11/1/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01914 | THE ESTATE OF KIRT RUE | 10/30/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 14, 15, 16 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |