19807 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2024EST01806 | THE ESTATE OF DORIS RICHARDSON | 10/28/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02041 | THE ESTATE OF GEORGE COLLINS | 10/25/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02021 | THE ESTATE OF EDITH SPEARS | 10/23/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01970 | THE ESTATE OF GERALD CREWS | 10/22/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01957 | THE ESTATE OF JOHN SANDERS | 10/21/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01952 | THE ESTATE OF RICHARD WEAR | 10/21/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01786 | THE ESTATE OF LUCILLE REED | 10/21/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01945 | THE ESTATE OF JUDITH LOVEALL | 10/21/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01962 | THE ESTATE OF THOMAS NAWMAN | 10/18/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01955 | THE ESTATE OF STEVEN MCINTURFF | 10/17/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST02001 | THE ESTATE OF ROGER GOLD | 10/17/2024 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01902 | THE ESTATE OF CAROLYN NETZLEY | 10/16/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01658 | THE ESTATE OF DENVER BRYSON | 10/16/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01856 | THE ESTATE OF DEBORAH CREEK | 10/15/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01917 | THE ESTATE OF JOSEPH WADE | 10/15/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01913 | THE ESTATE OF CARA CROWDER | 10/11/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01895 | THE ESTATE OF MILDRED DUNN | 10/11/2024 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01737 | THE ESTATE OF FORREST WALLER | 10/11/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01951 | THE ESTATE OF BRIAN STOVER | 10/11/2024 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 15, 16, 17 ... 989, 990, 991 Next |