19788 Cases | Probate
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
2025EST00537 | THE ESTATE OF CHARLES MCMILLAN | 3/25/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00460 | THE ESTATE OF WILLIAM HILL SR. | 3/25/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01050 | THE ESTATE OF HERBERT LENK | 3/25/2025 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00344 | THE ESTATE OF CATHERINE WAGENLANDER | 3/24/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00457 | THE ESTATE OF DAVID WAGNER | 3/21/2025 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00227 | THE ESTATE OF JIM NAYLOR | 3/21/2025 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00342 | THE ESTATE OF ADRIENNE DRAPER | 3/21/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00432 | THE ESTATE OF JUDITH YEAGER | 3/20/2025 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00495 | THE ESTATE OF RICHARD BLAKE | 3/19/2025 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00499 | THE ESTATE OF MARK CRUTCHER | 3/18/2025 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00483 | THE ESTATE OF SHARON CRAWFORD | 3/18/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00512 | THE ESTATE OF KAROLYN GRAHAM | 3/18/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00489 | THE ESTATE OF DANNY FINLEY | 3/18/2025 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00379 | THE ESTATE OF CHRISTINE PEPPO | 3/17/2025 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; W/O WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00363 | THE ESTATE OF JANICE BOLLINGER | 3/17/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00385 | THE ESTATE OF EARL HARRISON | 3/17/2025 | |||||||
EST: RELEASE OF ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST01733 | THE ESTATE OF GLENN STUMPFF II | 3/14/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN;PROBATE WILL | |||||||||
2024EST00237 | THE ESTATE OF JAMES MORROW | 3/14/2025 | |||||||
EST: TRANSFER OF REAL ESTATE ONLY; WITH WILL | |||||||||
2025EST00441 | THE ESTATE OF MATTHEW CULHAM | 3/14/2025 | |||||||
EST: FULL ADMIN; W/O WILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3, 4 ... 988, 989, 990 Next |