Daily Law Journal

Case Information

4/23/2025
12CVG04577
Dayton Municipal

Carla Spriestersbach , et al
Taquilla Jones And All Other Occupants, et al
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision Granting Sealing Of T

Laurence A Lasky of Lasky & Scharrer

Docket History

4/23/2025
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision Granting Sealing Of T

8/30/2012
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Entry Of Restitution - By Magistrate

8/20/2012
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Entry Of Restitution - By Magistrate

8/17/2012
Eviction Hearing

7/26/2012
Forcible Entry & Detainer