Daily Law Journal

Case Information

5/13/2025
23CVF03016
Kettering Municipal Assignments

LVNV FUNDING LLC
SHAMIKA BOTTOM

JAMES LONG

Docket History

4/29/2025

4/15/2025

12/22/2023

12/21/2023