Daily Law Journal

Case Information

6/3/2024
24CVF00111
Dayton Municipal

Lvnv Funding L L C
Julia Bocock
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Consent Judgment

Mia Wortham Spells
Nathan J Allen of Stenger & Stenger, P.C.

Docket History

5/23/2024
Pre Trial/ Telephone Conference

3/21/2024
Pre Trial/ Telephone Conference

2/8/2024
Answer

1/9/2024
Contract / Account Cases