Daily Law Journal

Case Information

5/13/2024
24CVF00112
Dayton Municipal

Lvnv Funding L L C
Henry Spivey
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Default Judgment

Mia Wortham Spells
Nathan J Allen of Stenger & Stenger, P.C.

Docket History

5/8/2024
Motion For Default Judgment

2/7/2024
Pre Trial/ Telephone Conference

1/29/2024
Answer

1/9/2024
Contract / Account Cases