Daily Law Journal

Case Information

8/15/2024
24CVF00131
Dayton Municipal

Midland Credit Management Inc
Terrill Helton
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Default Judgment

Nevenka Pavlovic of Midland Credit Management

Docket History

7/31/2024
Motion For Default Judgment

7/5/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Default Judgment

6/26/2024
Motion For Default Judgment

1/9/2024
Contract / Account Cases