Daily Law Journal

Case Information

4/23/2025
24CVF00899
Dayton Municipal

Velocity Investments LLC
Delmar Walker
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

William McCann of Javitch, Block Llc

Docket History

4/23/2025
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

4/15/2025
Garnishment Hearing

9/11/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Default Judgment

9/9/2024
Motion For Default Judgment

6/24/2024
Motion To Continue Dismissal Date

2/14/2024
Contract / Account Cases