Daily Law Journal

Case Information

4/24/2025
24CVF04901
Dayton Municipal

Cavalry Spv I, L L C
Larry Baumgardner
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Summary Judgment

Franklin W Gehres
Kimberly A Klemenok of Levy & Associates Llc

Docket History

2/20/2025
Motion For Summary Judgment

1/21/2025
Civil Trial

1/16/2025
Motion For Continuance

11/5/2024
Civil Trial

11/5/2024
Motion For Leave To File A Motion For Summary Judgment

9/18/2024
Answer

8/20/2024
Contract / Account Cases