Daily Law Journal

Case Information

4/29/2025
24CVF06244
Dayton Municipal

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc
Jacalyn M Vedder
Motion For Leave

Franklin W Gehres
Angela M Brown of Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., L.P.A.

Docket History

2/18/2025
Civil Pre-Trial

1/23/2025
Motion To Convert Trial Date To Pretrial

12/6/2024
Answer

10/28/2024
Contract / Account Cases