Daily Law Journal

Case Information

5/7/2025
24CVF06484
Dayton Municipal

Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc
Lee A Hiatt, Aka, Lee Ann Hiatt
Phone Pretrial

Deirdre E Logan
Angela M Brown of Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., L.P.A.

Docket History

2/26/2025
Phone Pretrial

1/31/2025
Notice Of Submission

12/17/2024
Answer

11/12/2024
Contract / Account Cases