Daily Law Journal

Case Information

4/29/2025
24CVF06525
Dayton Municipal

Lvnv Funding L L C
Tina Holman aka Tina Saunders
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry

Carl S Henderson
David B Bokor of Stenger & Stenger, P.C.

Docket History

3/19/2025
Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings

2/4/2025
Phone Pretrial

12/2/2024
Answer

11/13/2024
Contract / Account Cases