Case Information
2/29/2024
24CVG00118
Dayton Municipal
Greater Dayton Premier Management
Lakeshia Scott and all other occupants
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Agreed Entry Of Settlement
Christopher C Green
Docket History
2/27/2024
Motion For Stay Of Restitution
2/2/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre
2/2/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre
2/1/2024
Eviction Hearing - Gdpm
1/9/2024
Forcible Entry & Detainer