Daily Law Journal

Case Information

2/13/2024
24CVG00122
Dayton Municipal

Greater Dayton Premier Management
Robert Dewberry and all other occupants
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Agreed Entry Of Settlement

Christopher C Green

Docket History

2/6/2024
Motion To Stay Writ Of Restitution

2/2/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

2/2/2024
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

2/1/2024
Eviction Hearing - Gdpm

1/9/2024
Forcible Entry & Detainer