Daily Law Journal

Case Information

3/14/2024
24CVH00069
Dayton Municipal

BWB Properties
Morocco Fields Bey
Motion To Re-Open Case

John T Roberts of Law Office Of Joseph C Lucas, Llc

Docket History

3/7/2024
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

3/7/2024
Judgment: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

2/26/2024
Status Hearing

2/12/2024
Escrow Hearing

1/22/2024
Escrow Hearing

1/5/2024
Rent Escrow