Daily Law Journal

Case Information

4/30/2025
24CVH05707
Dayton Municipal

JLD Property Management Group Inc Bancroft Apartments
Latrice Echols
Motion For Continuance


Docket History

4/14/2025
Civil Status Hearing - Magistrate

3/24/2025
Civil Status Hearing - Magistrate

2/24/2025
Civil Status Hearing - Magistrate

1/27/2025
Civil Status Hearing - Magistrate

1/17/2025
Judgment: Magistrate's Order

12/9/2024
Civil Status Hearing - Magistrate

11/21/2024
Judgment: Entry And Order

11/4/2024
Escrow Hearing

10/21/2024
Emergency Escrow Hearing

10/1/2024
Rent Escrow