Daily Law Journal

Case Information

4/22/2025
24CVI06416
Dayton Municipal

Juan Vera
Timariha Allen
Judgment for the Defendant: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision


Docket History

4/22/2025
Judgment for the Defendant: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision

4/16/2025
Small Claims Hearing

3/5/2025
Judgment: Magistrate's Order

2/12/2025
Small Claims Hearing

1/29/2025
Small Claims Hearing

12/11/2024
Small Claims Hearing

11/7/2024
Small Claims