Daily Law Journal

Case Information

4/28/2025
25CVG00171
Dayton Municipal

Greater Dayton Premier Management
Emily Konst and all other occupants
Motion To Withdraw The Motion To Lift Stay Of Restitution

Christopher C Green

Docket History

2/13/2025
Judgment: Agreed Entry Of Settlement

2/3/2025
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

2/3/2025
Judgment for the Plaintiff: Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision On Restitution Of Pre

1/30/2025
Eviction Hearing - Gdpm

1/9/2025
Forcible Entry & Detainer